MM et al v. San Ramon Valley Unified School District
Plaintiff: MM, Irene Olivera and Michael MacDonald
Defendant: San Ramon Valley Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2012cv01337
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 19 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING (CORRECTED). This order replaces Docket No. 28. It corrects a typographical error on page 2, line 19 but is identical to Docket No. 28 in all other respects. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 28, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTIN re 11 Letter filed by Michael MacDonald, MM, Irene Olivera for Susan Foley to appear telephonically on 7/13/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/12/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MM et al v. San Ramon Valley Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MM
Represented By: Susan Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Olivera
Represented By: Susan Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael MacDonald
Represented By: Susan Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Ramon Valley Unified School District
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?