Ver v. Hurtado et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Ver
Defendant: Alfredo Hurtado and United States Of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv01365
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/6/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/6/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 7/5/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/26/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ver v. Hurtado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ver
Represented By: Lauren Beth Gelber
Represented By: Brian Leroy Larsen
Represented By: Meghan Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?