May v. Amgen, Inc.
Petitioner: Samuel J. May
Respondent: Amgen, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01367
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED ORDER REVOKING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL re 64 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/30/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [re 57 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 14 Declaration in Support, 29 Case Management Statement, 36 Order, 56 Order, 53 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Samuel J. May]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/23/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE DOCKET NUMBER 55 [re 55 Notice (Other) filed by Samuel J. May]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/14/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup [denying 50 Motion for Leave to File].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE re 50 MOTION for Leave to File. Responses due by 5/11/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 4, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
February 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING REFERRAL FOR DETERMINATION OF IFP STATUS re 41 USCA Order (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2013)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO DENY PLAINTIFFS PETITION TO VACATE OR MODIFY ARBITRAL AWARD [re 22 Renotice motion hearing filed by Samuel J. May] Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION1 [re 22 Renotice motion hearing filed by Samuel J. May]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/12/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR RENOTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 29, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Amgen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel J. May
Represented By: Samuel J May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amgen, Inc.
Represented By: Paul William Cane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?