Crosthwaite et al v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee and Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01464
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 20, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 MOTION to Vacate Clerks Notice REQUEST TO VACATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, et al.. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/14/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/11/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 22 Motion for Default Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER reset hearing as to 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court ]re 23 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT HEARING, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE HEARING DATE filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, et al. Motion Hearing reset for 8/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/10/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 MOTION to Vacate REQUEST TO VACATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by F. G. Crosthwaite,et al. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/13/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?