Perfect 10, Inc. v. Yandex N.V.
Plaintiff: Perfect 10, Inc.
Defendant: Yandex N.V.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01521
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 6, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER VACATING DEADLINES re 225 Order, Motions terminated: 196 , ***Deadlines terminated. 225 Order, Signed by Judge Alsup on August 8, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 8, 2013 HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/07/13.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Judge William Alsup [denying 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 192 Discovery Letter Brief and 194 Letter.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 163 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SUR-REPLY by Judge Alsup denying 170 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 173 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/29/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER VACATING DISCOVERY HEARING AND REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE [re 151 Letter filed by Yandex N.V., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes, Motions terminated: 150 Discovery Letter Brief re Defendant Yandex N.V.'s Responses to Perfect 10's Requests for Production of Documents (Sets 1 and 2) filed by Perfect 10, Inc., 152 MOTION to Continue - Request for Continuance and [Proposed] Order for Continuance of May 23, 2013 Hearing Regarding Protective Order filed by Perfect 10, Inc.].. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/22/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 146 Letter, filed by Yandex LLC, Yandex Inc, Yandex N.V.]. 3-1/2-Hour Meet-and-Confer in Court's jury room from 9:30 AM--1:30 PM (with 30-minute break for lunch at noon) on 5/23/2013. Discovery Hearing set for 5/23/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/20/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT re 136 Notice (Other) filed by Perfect 10, Inc., 134 Notice (Other), filed by Yandex LLC, Yandex Inc, Yandex N.V.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER directing updates settlement conf statements (5 pages max) to be filed by 4/11/13 at 2 p.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Response due by noon on 3/29/2013. 3-1/2 Hour Meet-and-Confer from 9:30 a.m.--1:30 p.m. (1/2 hour at noon for lunch) on 4/1/2013. Discovery Hearing set for 4/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/26/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (AS MODIFIED) by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 107 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re additional info and telephone pre-conf call. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/28/2013. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 83 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. William Alsup denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO DISMISS re 24 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PERFECT 10'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 35 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Responses due by noon on 8/6/2012. Meet-and-confer to commence starting at 7:30 A.M. and continuing through to 11:30 A.M. on 8/8/2012 in the Court's jury room in the federal courthouse. Discovery Hearing set for 8/8/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/31/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 34 First Discovery Letter Briefre Perfect 10's Demand to Take Apex Deposition filed by Yandex N.V.]. Responses due by noon on 8/6/2012. Meet-and-confer in Court' s jury room starting from 10:00 AM and continuing through to 2:30 PM (with half-hour for lunch at noon) on 8/9/2012. Discovery Hearing set for 8/9/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/27/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STRIKING DISCOVERY LETTER re 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of July 25, 2012 Letter and Exhibits filed by Perfect 10, Inc., 31 Received Document filed by Perfect 10, Inc., 32 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Yandex N.V.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 26, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 25 Stipulation].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY ON ISSUES OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND VACATING JUNE 14 HEARING re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Yandex N.V., 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Yandex N.V. filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 11, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY DEADLINES re 15 Stipulation filed by Yandex N.V.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfect 10, Inc. v. Yandex N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfect 10, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Jon Benink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yandex N.V.
Represented By: Rory S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?