District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Harrison
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, Doug Christopher, District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice & Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees, Steve Havens, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees and District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Defendant: Gary Steven Harrison
Case Number: 3:2012cv01551
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/28/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/7/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (whalc3, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/5/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 14, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Christopher
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice & Journeyman Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Havens
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, and its Board of Trustees
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Steven Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?