Bowlin v. Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Billy Bowlin
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01593
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/18/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER - All dispositive motions shall be served and filed by 6/6/2013. Dispositive motions will be heard no later 7/17/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5 days shall commence on 9/9/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/5/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins deferring ruling on 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, continuing hearing to December 19, 2012 at 1:00, and finding as moot 34 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/2/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowlin v. Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Bowlin
Represented By: Michael E. Velarde
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of the Greater East Bay, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Susanne Helman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?