Mount Hamilton Partners LLC v. Google Inc.
Plaintiff: Mount Hamilton Partners LLC
Defendant: Google Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv01698
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/23/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER, Motions terminated: 130 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Google Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/13 is continued to 2/7/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/12/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER :Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/13 is continued to 12/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco., Motions terminated: (97 in 3:12-cv-01700-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (96) Clerks Notice, (9 5) Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,, Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC, (128 in 3:12-cv-01698-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (126) Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,, (127) Clerks Notice, Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/17/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER, Motions terminated: (125 in 3:12-cv-01698-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (124) Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,, CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Groupon, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/22/13 is continued to 12/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/16/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER, Motions terminated: (92 in 3:12-cv-01700-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Further CMC filed by Google, Inc., (123 in 3:12-cv-01698-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER F OR CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/3/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE: ADDITIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT 82 in case 3:12-cv-01700-SI; 113 in case 3:12-cv-01698-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER RE: DISPUTED CLAIMS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 100 Ex Parte Application (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 5/10/13 is continued to 8/23/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/9/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER CONTINUING DATES OF TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING 68 in 12-1700 91 in 12-1698 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/15/2013 03:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/8/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/20/13., Motions terminated: 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing Dates filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, Motions terminated: 58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Google Inc, Mount Hamilton Partners LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/14/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed on 8/9/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mount Hamilton Partners LLC v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Hamilton Partners LLC
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Jenna F Leavitt
Represented By: Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Heather R. Bobkova
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: James C. Pistorino
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Victoria Q. Smith
Represented By: James F. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?