Mount Hamilton Partners LLC v. Groupon Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Mount Hamilton Partners LLC
Defendant: Groupon Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01700
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:11-cv-01268. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2012: # 2 Transmittal) (ga, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2012 Case transferred to United States District Court, Northern District of California. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (nms)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Transfer Action to the Northern District of California, filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/3/2012. (nms)
April 3, 2012 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Action to the Northern District of California by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: At the hearing held on 3/20/2012, in related civil action 11-1269-RGA, the Defendant in that case advised that an application to transfer would be filed in the next few weeks. The Court advised that it would like to hear oral argument on both that application and the motion for similar relief pending in this case at the same time. The oral argument regarding D.I. 10 set for 4/11/2012, at 10:00 AM is CANCELED, and will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2012. (nms)
March 20, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jenna F. Leavitt for Mount Hamilton Partners LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, or Alternatively, the Northern District of California. filed by Groupon Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Yule DePriest filed by Groupon Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2012. (nms)
March 16, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Yule DePriest - filed by Groupon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian)
March 12, 2012 Filing 16 ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC.(Farnan, Brian)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: Oral Argument on 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, or Alternatively, the Northern District of California is scheduled for 4/11/2012, at at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/12/2012. (nms)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jenna F. Leavitt filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/8/2012. (nms)
March 8, 2012 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jenna F. Leavitt re 13 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Piergiovanni, Rosemary) Modified on 3/9/2012 (nms).
March 8, 2012 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Rakesh Ramde re 13 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. (Piergiovanni, Rosemary) Modified on 3/9/2012 (nms).
March 8, 2012 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, or Alternatively, the Northern District of California. filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2012. (Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
March 8, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jenna F. Leavitt - filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. (Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
February 20, 2012 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, or Alternatively, the Northern District of California. filed by Groupon Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rostocki, Brian)
February 20, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, or Alternatively, the Northern District of California. - filed by Groupon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian)
February 17, 2012 Filing 9 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Mount Hamilton Partners LLC by Groupon Inc..(Rostocki, Brian)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James T. Hultquist, Esquire of Reed Smith LLP, filed by Groupon Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2012. (nms)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Khurram Nasir Gore, Esquire of Reed Smith LLP, filed by Groupon Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2012. (nms)
February 3, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James T. Hultquist, Esquire of Reed Smith LLP - filed by Groupon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian)
February 3, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Khurram Nasir Gore, Esquire of Reed Smith LLP - filed by Groupon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian)
January 17, 2012 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time for Defendant Groupon, Inc. to Respond to 1 Complaint, by Groupon Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 1/17/2012 (nms).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Extension of Time For Defendant Groupon, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint, filed by Groupon Inc., )Reset Answer Deadlines: Groupon Inc. answer due 2/17/2012). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/17/2012. (nms)
December 28, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. Groupon Inc. served on 12/28/2011, answer due 1/18/2012. (Farnan, Brian)
December 28, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01268-RGA, 1:11-cv-01269-RGA(rjb)
December 22, 2011 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC identifying Corporate Parent Innovation Management Sciences, LLC for Mount Hamilton Partners LLC.. (Farnan, Brian)
December 22, 2011 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Groupon Inc. on 12/22/2011. Requesting party should contact the Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to arrange for pick-up or mailing of the summons. (dmp, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,904,334 B2;. (dmp, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Groupon Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-996065.) - filed by Mount Hamilton Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mount Hamilton Partners LLC v. Groupon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Hamilton Partners LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Jenna F Leavitt
Represented By: Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?