Hogue v. M+W U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Philip Hogue
Defendant: M+W U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01712
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Opposition is due November 2, 2012; reply is due November 16, 2012. The hearing is continued to November 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/10/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The Case Management Conference is rescheduled from August 3, 2012 to August 10, 2012. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogue v. M+W U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Hogue
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Thacker
Represented By: Scott D. Gattey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M+W U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Pia
Represented By: Jack Conrad-Charles Praetzellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?