Twitter, Inc. v. Skootle Corp. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Defendant: Skootle Corp., JL4 Web Solutions, Justin Clark, James Kester, Jayson Yanuaria, James Lucero and Garland E. Harris
Case Number: 3:2012cv01721
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Filing 95 STIPULATION of Dismissal Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Twitter, Inc., Skootie Corp., James Kester, Troy Fales. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER re 93 STIPULATED CONSENT ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATED CONSENT ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Consent Order filed by Twitter, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re [Proposed] Stipulated Consent Order filed by Twitter, Inc., Skootle Corp., James Kester & Troy Fales. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 91 Letter from Charles T. Graves to The Honorable Jon S. Tigar. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2013.Court staff received a telephone call from attorneys representing Twitter, Inc. and Skootle Corp., requesting a telephone conference with the court for the purpose of discussing how the parties might edit the parties proposed order to convince the court to retain jurisdiction over the parties' settlement after the parties have dismissed the case. The court rarely retains jurisdiction over any settlement. The post-dismissal enforcement of settlements is typically a matter for the state courts. If the parties in this case feel that they can demonstrate good cause for the retention of federal jurisdiction, they should file a motion. The request for a telephone conference is DENIED. (This is a text-only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry.)(jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying re 88 Stipulation. The parties' stipulated dismissal is contingent upon the Court issuing a Consent Order and retaining jurisdiction over this case. The Court will not exercise such jurisdiction, and therefore the stipulation is DENIED. The parties shall either file a non-contingent stipulation of dismissal by June 19, which will dismiss the case without court order pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or the parties shall attend the June 26 case management conference prepared to discuss the future of this action.(jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 88 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re [Proposed] Stipulated Terms of Settlement and Consent Order filed by Twitter, Inc., Skootle Corp., James Kester, Troy Fales. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Stipulated Request for Dismissal due by 6/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 7, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 86 Letter from Charles T. Graves and Nicole M. Norris re April 10, 2013 Case Management Conference. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 12, 2013 Filing 85 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 26, 2013 Filing 84 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Statement filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings., Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Richard W. Wieking for Executive Committee on 2/11/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER extending discovery cutoff deadlines and motion hearing to 6/24/13. Motions terminated: 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Deadlines filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/7/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Deadlines filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
December 17, 2012 Filing 80 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byTroy Fales, James Kester, Skootle Corp.. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Troy Fales (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twitter, Inc.. Troy Fales served on 11/27/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 27, 2012 Filing 77 Summons on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Troy Fales. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for (1) Breach of Contract; (2) Tortious Interference with Contract; (3) Fraud; and (4) Unfair or Deceptive Business Practices against Troy Fales, James Kester, Skootile Corpp. Filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 11/19/2012) Modified on 11/27/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2012 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/16/2012), Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 68 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 73 RESPONSE (re 68 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint ) filed byJames Kester, Skootle Corp.. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 is advanced to 12:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The court is not available Friday afternoon. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 6, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 67 MOTION to Continue Stipulated Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Deadlines filed by Twitter, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/1/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 69 Declaration in Support of 68 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Declaration of Charles T. Graves In Support of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Charles) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 31, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to Continue Stipulated Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Deadlines filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Charles) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 66 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/12 is continued to 11/8/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there are no documents associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 65 Statement Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Issues by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Graves, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 64 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Statement filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE by Twitter, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Private Mediation (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 62 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/31/2012 before Judge Susan Illston (Date Filed: 8/31/2012). Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses to dispositive motions due by 4/26/2013. Replies due by 5/3/2013. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/31/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Twitter, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 28, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 24, 2012 Filing 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 55 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 57 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Defendants' ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 56 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 55 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Twitter, Inc. filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SEVERING DEFENDANT FOR MISJOINDER. Dismissing without prejudice plaintiffs claims against defendant Harris. If plaintiff wishes to pursue its claims against Harris, it must do so in a separate lawsuit.(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/20/2012) Modified on 7/23/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE setting 8/31/12 case management conference (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 52 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 51 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 50 RESPONSE to re 45 Order, Skootle and Kester's Reply to Twitter's Response to Order to Show Cause by Skootle Corp.. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Volutary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Twitter, Inc. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 48 Response to Order to Show Cause 45 Order, Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause byTwitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing From 7/12 to 7/13/12 at 9:00 a.m., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 41 MOTION Motion to Serve Foreign Defendants by Alternative Means . Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Twitter, Inc. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before July 2, 2012, plaintiff shall respond showing why this Court should not sever the claims against the different sets of defendants, requiring plaintiff to prosecute separate cases. Defendants may file a response, if any, on or before July 9, 2012. The Court will take the matter under submission. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2012) Modified on 6/26/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS (RE: GARLAND HARRIS) 16 23 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed on 6/11/12 (as amended) by Judge Illstongranting 19 Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Prejudice as to as to Justin Clerk d/b/a TweetBuddy.com only. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 42 Declaration of Charles T. Graves in Support of 41 MOTION Motion to Serve Foreign Defendants by Alternative Means filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION Motion to Serve Foreign Defendants by Alternative Means filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/20/2012. Replies due by 6/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Graves, Charles) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 5, 2012 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE setting defts motion to dismiss on 6/29/12 @ 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2012 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 38 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Garland E. Harris. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE (re 23 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiff Twitter, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Garland E. Harris's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Kester CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 30 (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 33 James Kester's ANSWER to Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 29 byJames Kester. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 32 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Kester.. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 31 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Skootle Corp... (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 30 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 34 . *** Certificate of Interested Entities by James Kester (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2012 Filing 29 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 33 . *** James Kester's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded , COUNTERCLAIM against Twitter, Inc. byJames Kester. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: granting 22 Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by 5/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by 5/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 26 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Justin Clark. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garland E. Harris re 23 MOTION to Dismiss (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Garland E. Harris in Support of 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGarland E. Harris. (Related document(s) 23 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the case against Garland E. Harris filed by Garland E. Harris. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/25/2012. Replies due by 6/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION for permission for electronic case filing filed by Garland E. Harris. Responses due by 5/25/2012. Replies due by 6/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Prejudice and Consent Judgment, 18 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Prejudice and Consent Judgment filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 18 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twitter, Inc. .. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Charles T. Graves in Support of 16 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Garland E. Harris and Certificate of Service filed by Twitter, Inc. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Garland E. Harris and Certificate of Service filed by Twitter, Inc. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Skootle Corp. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded by Skootle Corp. (Norris, Nicole) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. Certificate of Service of Mailing by plaintiff Twitter, Inc. to Defendant JL4 Web Solutions, Summons and Complaint mailed 05/03/2012, witnessed by District Court (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. Certificate of Service of Mailing by plaintiff Twitter, Inc. to Defendant Jayson Yanuaria, Summons and Complaint mailed 05/03/2012, witnessed by District Court Clerk (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twitter, Inc.. James Kester served on 4/30/2012, answer due 5/21/2012. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twitter, Inc.. Garland E. Harris served on 4/12/2012, answer due 5/3/2012. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 9 (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 9 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 10 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twitter, Inc.. Justin Clark served on 4/11/2012, answer due 5/2/2012. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. Certificate of Service of Mailing by plaintiff Twitter, Inc. Summons and Complaint mailed 04/11/2012, witnessed by clerk (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. Certificate of Service of Mailing by plaintiff Twitter, Inc. Summons and Complaint mailed 04/11/2012, witnessed by clerk (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twitter, Inc.. Skootle Corp. served on 4/9/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Clark, Garland E. Harris, JL4 Web Solutions, James Kester, James Lucero, Skootle Corp., Jayson Yanuaria ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611072627). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byTwitter, Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitter, Inc. v. Skootle Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Tait Graves
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Riana Siobhan Pfefferkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skootle Corp.
Represented By: Douglas Woodruff Colt
Represented By: Nicole Michelle Norris
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL4 Web Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson Yanuaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?