Salimi et al v. BMW Financial Services NA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Salimi and August Galarga
Defendant: BMW Financial Services NA, LLC and Asset Acquisition Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv01754
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2018. Replies due by 7/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/12/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 101 STIPULATION Continuing Status Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 95 REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE; AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016) Modified on 3/9/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER of referral for purpose of determining relationship. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/6/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 77 STIPULATION CERTIFYING CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 19, 2014. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2014 11:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REQUIRING CLARIFICATION ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified on 3/3/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING 55 Joint Case Management Statement. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING: 33 STIPULATION To Vacate Court-Assigned Mediator and Proceed With Scheduled JAMS Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/14/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 27 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salimi et al v. BMW Financial Services NA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Salimi
Represented By: Nancy Barron
Represented By: Nance Felice Becker
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Represented By: Dan Leo Gildor
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August Galarga
Represented By: Nancy Barron
Represented By: Nance Felice Becker
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Represented By: Dan Leo Gildor
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW Financial Services NA, LLC
Represented By: Christopher H. Doyle
Represented By: Michael John Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acquisition Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher H. Doyle
Represented By: Michael John Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?