Collins v. Duracell, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Collins
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company and Duracell, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01778
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/2/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Statement of Non-Opposition, filed by The Gillette Company, The Procter & Gamble Company, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 45 Statement of Non-Opposition,. Responses due by 9/20/2013. Replies due by 10/22/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/9/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION Modifying Schedule for Expert Discovery and Class Certification filed by James Collins. Motions due by 5/13/2013. Replies due by 6/27/2013. Responses due by 6/13/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/21/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER Modifying Schedule for Expert Discovery and Class Certification re 31 : Motions due by 3/5/2013. Responses due by 4/5/2013. Replies due by 4/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/9/2012. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on E-Discovery filed by James Collins. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 20, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by James Collins , The Gillette Company, and The Procter & Gamble Company filed by James Collins, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/11/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Duracell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Darren Keith Cottriel
Represented By: Robert Allan Mittelstaedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duracell, Inc.
Represented By: Darren Keith Cottriel
Represented By: Robert Allan Mittelstaedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Collins
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Represented By: Noah M. Schubert
Represented By: Miranda Kolbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?