Breville Pty Limited et al v. Storebound LLC
Plaintiff: Breville Pty Limited and Breville USA, Inc.
Defendant: Storebound LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv01783
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Breville USA, Inc., Breville Pty Limited. Advice of Counsel due 10/7/2013. Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2013. Designation of Expert Witness due by 11/18/2013. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 12/16/2013. Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER CONSTRUING TERMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,479,851. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING STOREBOUND'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND GRANTING BREVILLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE STOREBOUND'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND DISMISS STOREBOUND'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying 54 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Claims Construction Briefing Schedule filed by Breville USA, Inc., Breville Pty Limited. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 37 MOTION to Dismiss BY PLAINTIFFS' AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' BREVILLE PTY LIMITED AND BREVILLE USA, INC., 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by Storebound LLC, 57 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulation to Modify Claims Construction Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 44 STIPULATION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO EXTEND THE LOCAL PATENT RULE DISCLOSURE DEADLINES TO FACILITATE MEDIATION. Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/12/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/5/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION TO PERMIT FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 20, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/25/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breville Pty Limited et al v. Storebound LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storebound LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breville Pty Limited
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Meckes
Represented By: Nathan Lane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breville USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Lane, III
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Meckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?