Caldwell v. City of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Caldwell
Defendant: City of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department, Kitt Crenshaw, Arthur Gerrans and James Crowley
Case Number: 3:2012cv01892
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 423 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Monell Claim. Signed on 12/23/2020.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 422 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed on 10/26/2020. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/22/2020. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 393 Motion to Continue Date of Defendants Motion for Attorneys fees from April 26, 2016 to May 3, 2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting parties' request to continue the further case management conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The further case management conference is continued to 3/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER Following Further Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/19/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Compel 161 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER regarding the Parties' October 22, 2015 joint letter 218 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Re Defendant's motion to compel 161 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laprote. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER regarding Defendant's motion to compel 161 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint 130 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 84 Motion for Protective Order and denying 87 Motion to Bifurcate by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
June 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 request to withdraw as co-counsel signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 06/4/14. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: the case management conference presently set for May 23, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. is continued until June 17, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. An updated joint case management statement is due June 10, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 44 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION To Continue April 4, 2013 Case Management Conference filed by Maurice Caldwell, City of San Francisco, Kitt Crenshaw, James Crowley, Arthur Gerrans. Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/21/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to 12/4/2012 at 9:00a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 12, 2012. (edllc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE, RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, AND MOTION HEARING DATE filed by Kitt Crenshaw, James Crowley, Arthur Gerrans. Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/26/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by City of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/6/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. City of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Caldwell
Represented By: Brian Edward Claypool
Represented By: Paige Gustin Kaneb
Represented By: Linda Carol Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitt Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Gerrans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?