Marchelos et al v. Reputation.Com
Plaintiff: George Marchelos and Amy Kassenbrock
Defendant: Reputation.Com
Case Number: 3:2012cv01899
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL; CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS; AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE WRITTEN RESPONSE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2013 is CONTINUED to 4/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation, filed by Amy Kassenbrock, Reputation.Com, George Marchelos, 32 Proposed Order, filed by George Marchelos. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/9/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/5/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/31/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2012 is CONTINUED to 11/5/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchelos et al v. Reputation.Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reputation.Com
Represented By: Kristen Garcia Dumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Marchelos
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kassenbrock
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?