Sullivan et al v. City of San Rafael et al
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Sullivan and Koji Fujita
Defendant: Ryan Cogbill, City of San Rafael, San Rafael Police Department and Ryan Demarta
Case Number: 3:2012cv01922
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 78 Stipulation to continue pretrial dates. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER EXCUSING OFFICERS RYAN COGBILL AND RYAN DEMARTA FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERNCE: Re 69 Letter filed by San Rafael Police Department, City of San Rafael, Ryan Cogbill, Ryan Demarta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/7/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Status Report due by 7/15/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 58 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Related Briefing Schedule. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 50 Stipulation to Continue Dates for Expert Disclosures and Disclosures of Rebuttal Experts. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 47 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/2/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 42 Stipulation to continue date for disclosure of experts and disclosure of rebuttal experts. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/14/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 26 Stipulation and Protective Order. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs to file amended complaint by August 24, 2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/26/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 4 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF SAN RAFAEL, RYAN DEMARTA AND RYAN COGBILLS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(B)] filed by San Rafael Police Department, City of San Rafael, Ryan Cogbill, Ryan Demarta. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/10/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS re 8 Letter Brief, filed by San Rafael Police Department, City of San Rafael, Ryan Cogbill, Ryan Demarta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/31/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan et al v. City of San Rafael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Cogbill
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Rafael
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Rafael Police Department
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Demarta
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Sullivan
Represented By: James Donald Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koji Fujita
Represented By: James Donald Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?