Brown v. Contra Costa County et al
Plaintiff: David Glen Brown
Defendant: Doug MacMaster, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Mark Peterson and Karen Zelis-Holder
Case Number: 3:2012cv01923
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 144 Motion for Summary Judgment (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014) Modified on 12/15/2014 (knm, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 62 Motion to Dismiss; denying 70 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING re 58 Stipulation filed by Mark Peterson, Contra Costa County, Douglas MacMaster, Karen Zelis-Holder. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/16/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; denying 46 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Please see document 23 for corrected OrderORDER re 21 Letter filed by Doug MacMaster, Mark Peterson, Contra Costa County, Karen Zelis-Holder. Signed by Judge 8/16/2012 on Hamilton. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified on 8/17/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug MacMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Zelis-Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Glen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?