Forrester et al v. Orkin, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eva Forrester, Christopher M. Forrester, Bryan Thomas Forrester and Stefanie Forrester
Defendant: Orkin, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01975
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand to State Court, 37 MOTION for Hearing Notice of Motion to Add Party; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Replies due by 5/17/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Orkin Services of California, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Count II (Wrongful Death) from Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBSTITUTING ORKIN SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. AS NAMED DEFENDANT FOR ORKIN, INC. AND ORKIN EXTERMINATING COMPANY re 22 Proposed Order filed by Eva Forrester. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/16/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS ORKIN, INC. AND ORKIN EXTERMINATING COMPANY re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendants Orkin, Inc and Orkin Exterminating Company, Inc. Only; [Proposed] Order filed by Orkin, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/7/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/6/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forrester et al v. Orkin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Forrester
Represented By: Scott H.Z. Sumner
Represented By: Elise Rochelle Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Forrester
Represented By: Scott H.Z. Sumner
Represented By: Elise Rochelle Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Thomas Forrester
Represented By: Elise Rochelle Sanguinetti
Represented By: Scott H.Z. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Forrester
Represented By: Elise Rochelle Sanguinetti
Represented By: Scott H.Z. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orkin, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Francis Charles
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?