Vargas et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Vargas and Hilda Vargas
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv02008
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE: LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/3/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2013. Responding brief due 9/9/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 71 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ATTORNEY OBI'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REINSTATING CASE DEADLINES. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/19/2013 at 2:00 PM. Joint Pretrial S tatement due by 8/21/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR: Show Cause Response due by NOON on 7/16/2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO ATTEND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 27 Motion to Appear by Telephone].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 19, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Vargas
Represented By: Ephraim O. Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Vargas
Represented By: Ephraim O. Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?