Hoa v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Paul Hoa
Defendant: Matthew Cate, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, San Quentin State Prison, David F. Lopez, T. Gregory Stagnito, Michael Martel, Bridge Transport and Stag Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02078
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 198 FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.CIV.P. 41(a)(1) filed by Paul Hoa. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONEERENCE FROM 11/20/15 to 12/17/15. Status Report due by 12/10/2015. Status Conference set for 12/17/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 18, 2015 TO JUNE 25, 2015 filed by Paul Hoa Status Report due by 6/25/2015. Status Conference set for 7/2/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 146 Cross-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC from 12/11/14 to 1/29/15. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing for Cross-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 146 (emclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 148 STIPULATION GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO COMPLETE PRE-DISCOVERY MEDIATION AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Richard Riley, Raymond Matteucci, Thomas Aliotto, Tammy Foss, Ronald Chan, David Moore, George Moon. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/11/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco, Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 138 Crossclaim, to Extend Time to Answer filed by Stag Leasing, Inc., T. Gregory Stagnito, David F. Lopez, Bridge Transport. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 119 Amended Complaint, filed by Stag Leasing, Inc., T. Gregory Stagnito, David F. Lopez, Bridge Transport. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Richard Riley, Raymond Matteucci, Thomas Aliotto, Tammy Foss, Ronald Chan, David Moore, George Moon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 127 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Richard Riley, Raymond Matteucci, Thomas Aliotto, Tammy Foss, Ronald Chan, David Moore, George Moon Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 5/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/14/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 111 STIPULATION CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM NOVEMBER 14, 2013 TO NOVEMBER 21, 2013 filed by Paul Hoa. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SECOND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE, Motions terminated: 90 , 98 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/23/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 79 Cate's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Re 79 Cate's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, Motions terminated: 78 76 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/3/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE 66 71 . Further Discovery Hearing set for 8/21/2013 01:00 PM. Parties shall file a joint discovery status report by 8/14/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/18/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC TO 5/30/13 at 10:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by Matthew Cate. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 2/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 32 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Granting Continuance on Hearing of Defendant Matthew Cate's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)6 and for Qualified Immunity filed by Matthew Cate. Case Management Conference reset for 11/9/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/31/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/5/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoa v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hoa
Represented By: James Alexander Kim
Represented By: Jason Yau Lie
Represented By: Gene Hitoshi Shioda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gregory Stagnito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stag Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?