Kratzke v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff: Kevin Kratzke
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 3:2012cv02094
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/25/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kratzke v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kratzke
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Cohelan
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Represented By: Michael David Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?