Yevgeniy Davidovich v. County of San Mateo et al
Plaintiff: Yevgeniy Davidovich
Defendant: County of San Mateo, Greg Munks and Does
Case Number: 3:2012cv02148
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE HEARING, TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT re 104 Notice filed by Yevgeniy Davidovich. Settlement Compliance Hearing set for 2/6/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Compel Rule 35 Examinations. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO THE NATIONAL PERSONNEL RECORDS CENTER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/30/2013 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 39 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yevgeniy Davidovich v. County of San Mateo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yevgeniy Davidovich
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Meola
Represented By: Kathryn E Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks
Represented By: Kathryn E Meola
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Kathryn E Meola
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Meola
Represented By: Kathryn E Meola
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?