Hicks v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Hicks
Defendant: William Kula, Linda Neal and R. Dosange
Case Number: 3:2012cv02207
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TO SEAL ONE EXHIBIT 50 51 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS 40 43 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER 28 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 10 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE AND DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION REQUEST 2 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Dosange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?