Avocet Sports Technology, Inc. v. Polar Electro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Avocet Sports Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Polar Electro, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02234
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 44 Motion for Attorney Fees.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #, 22 filed by Polar Electro, Inc. Motions due by 1/29/2013. Responses due by 2/12/2013. Replies due by 2/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/8/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avocet Sports Technology, Inc. v. Polar Electro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avocet Sports Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Frear Stephen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Electro, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Moran
Represented By: Janelle M Smith
Represented By: Matthew P. Vafidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?