Miller et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Brooks Miller and Ron Usoalii Nikotemo Miller
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, Wells Fargo Bank NA and Atlantic & Pacific Foreclosure Services
Case Number: 3:2012cv02282
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 205 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration ; and denying 212 Plaintiff's Motion for Costs and Damages (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's response is due by 8/27/2013. Defendants shall file reply by 9/3/2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 141 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 157 Defendants' Motion to Strike; and Denying 171 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Re Rule 56(d) Request. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/11/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Re 115 116 Plaintiff's Requests for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for 111 Plaintiff's Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 88 89 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying 49 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions; granting 63 Plaintiffs' "Motion to Extend Time"; and finding moot 65 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER (mailed to parties). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Brooks Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Usoalii Nikotemo Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic & Pacific Foreclosure Services
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?