Thompson et al v. Macy's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nasrin Baheri and Brian Thompson
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02294
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 35 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MACY'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/5/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/21/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/4/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Macy's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Myles Lenkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasrin Baheri
Represented By: Ashley Sarah Feder
Represented By: Brian Jeffrey Virag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Represented By: Brian Jeffrey Virag
Represented By: Ashley Sarah Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?