Abram v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Walter Abram
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv02381
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/29/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/24/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 23, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jefffrey S. White on 8/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Abram
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?