AF Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: AF Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2012cv02393
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 61 Application for Stay of Execution filed by AF Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on June 19, 2013. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/8/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING HEARING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 25 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FURTHER ORDER RE: UNDERTAKING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/9/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting as modified 15 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by AF Holdings, LLC. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/7/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/28/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Ex Parte Application. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/1/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AF Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?