Garcia v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and Ryan Jones
Case Number: 3:2012cv02443
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. The parties' request to have until August 15, 2015 to file a stipulation for dismissal or updated status statement is granted. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/14/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER VACATING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of 50 Order Staying Case entered by District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/13/2013, the Further Settlement Conference previously set on 12/2/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/14/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/13/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Settlement Conferences for both actions C-12-1900-JCS and C-12-2443-SBA shall be conducted jointly on 4/22/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Settlement Conferences briefs and exhibits as to Orozco v. City and County of San Francisco, et al C-12-1900-JCS are to be lodged with Judge Ryu no later than 4/18/13 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/18/13.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/18/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2013 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/15/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 to Continue Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference filed by Ryan Jones, Jose Garcia, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/16/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 13 Stipulation to Modify Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines. The Telephonic Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 10/24/12 at 2:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/28/12 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/5/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Andrew P. McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Jones
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?