Giovanni v. Bank of America, National Association
Plaintiff: Katheryn Giovanni
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 3:2012cv02530
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER dismissing case. Plaintiff did not file an amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall close the file. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Amended Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 33 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/17/2013. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JANUARY 3, 2013 re 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/21/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 24 Motion to Dismiss and VACATING the hearing previously scheduled for December 20, 2012.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/5/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: re 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Bank of America, National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/19/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giovanni v. Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katheryn Giovanni
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Abraham Joshua Colman
Represented By: Raymond Yoon Ho Kim
Represented By: Alexis A. Rochlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?