Smith -v- Overland Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mitchell Smith
Defendant: Overland Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02642
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DETERMINING THAT CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/10/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER VACATING SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/28/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 48 Stipulation; granting 49 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER ON STIPULATION CONCERNING NEW DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/15/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Status Report filed by Overland Contracting, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/2/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Status Report due by 3/29/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 22 Stipulation to dismiss seventh and eighth causes of action. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Stipulation Re: Continuation of Mediation Deadline. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 8 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith -v- Overland Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overland Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Julia H Azrael
Represented By: John Slade Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Smith
Represented By: Brad Stuckey
Represented By: Ralph Dennis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?