Trammell v. Barbara's Bakery Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard W. Trammell
Defendant: Barbara's Bakery Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02664
Filed: May 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 39 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Intervene filed by Olympia Moro, Erin Silber, Gabriel Rojas, Set Hearing as to 46 MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Opposing Defendant Barbara's Baker y, Inc.'s Request for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT & JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC filed by Richard W. Trammell. Case Management Conference reset for 4/26/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Richard W. Trammell. Second Amended Complaint due by 2/4/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Barbara's Bakery Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on August 20, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/12/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trammell v. Barbara's Bakery Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Trammell
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara's Bakery Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Eldredge
Represented By: Adam D Friedenberg
Represented By: Clement L. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?