Bell-Sparrow v. Wiltz et al
Plaintiff: Arlene Bell-Sparrow
Defendant: Paul Wiltz, Mone't Inc. and Wonda McGowan
Case Number: 3:2012cv02782
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CORRECTED ORDER RE: PRO TEM TRANSCRIPT (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT McGOWAN 70 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER (1) CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND (2) ISSUING RAND NOTICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT MCGOWAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (2) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; AND (3) CONTINUING THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO 3:00 P.M.ON FEBRUARY 7, 2014 58 60 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (Illston, Susan).
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE 23 32 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 15 21 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell-Sparrow v. Wiltz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Bell-Sparrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mone't Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wonda McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?