F. ovo Aetna
Plaintiff: Dennis F., Carol F., Ed L., Mindy L., Mark P., Mura T. and Edward T.
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv02819
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND MERITS BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE. Plaintiffs will file their opening brief on the merits no later than October 2, 2017, defendants will file their opposition brief no later than October 30, 2017, and plaintiffs shall file their reply brief no later than November 20, 2017. The hearing is continued from November 17, 2017, to December 15, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/30/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, plaintiffs' deadline to file their opening brief on the merits is extended to September 1, 2017, defendant's deadline to file their opp osition brief is extended to September 29, 2017, and plaintiffs' deadline to file their reply is extended to October 20, 2017. The hearing on the merits is continued to November 17, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFERRED PORTION OF PARTIES' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. To the extent the parties initially sought an order sealing the documents attached as Exhibits A through E to their joint n otice, their Joint Administrative Motion to file under seal is denied as moot, and, as the non-confidential materials included on the USB drive have been filed in the public record, the USB drive and its contents may remain under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON PARTIES' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. To the extent any party seeks an order sealing one or more of the documents identified by Bates number in the Court's order, such party is directed to file, no later than July 20, 2017, a declaration establishing a cognizable basis for such sealing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON THE MERITS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs shall file their opening brief on the merits no later than July 28, 2017, defendants shall file their opposition brief on the merit s no later than August 25, 2017, and plaintiffs shall file their reply brief on the merits no later than September 15, 2017. The Court will hold a hearing on the merits on October 13, 2017. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for July 21, 2017, is continued to January 26, 2018. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MAY 12, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 21, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER RE: STANDARD OF REVIEW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT. Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company is directed to file in the public record, no earlier than April 14, 2017, and no later than April 20, 2017, the following documents: (1) an unredacted version of Aetna's Opposition to Memorandum Regarding Standard of Review; (2) an unredacted version of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Heather Richardson in Support of Opposition to Memorandum Regarding Standard of Review; and (3) Exhibits D, F, I, K, N, P, R, T, W, and Y to the Declaration of Heather Richardson in Support of Opposition to Memorandum Regarding Standard of Review. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017) Modified on 4/10/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for April 21, 2017, is hereby continued to May 12, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, plaintiffs shall submit their supplemental reply no later than February 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON STANDARD OF REVIEW AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Per the parties' stipulation, plaintiffs shall file their supplemental memorandum no l ater than February 13, 2017, and the Case Management Conference is continued to March 24, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON STANDARD OF REVIEW. Defendant must submit its supplemental memorandum in support of its opposition no later than January 13, 2017. Plaintiffs must submit their supplemental reply no later than February 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON STANDARD OF REVIEW. Defendant must submit its supplemental memorandum in support of its opposition no later than January 6, 2017. Plaintiffs must submit their supple mental reply no later than January 30, 2017. The briefing schedule on the merits, as set forth in the Court's July 22, 2016 Order (Dkt No. 180) is vacated. Within fourteen days of the Court's order on the Standard of Review, the parties shall submit a joint stipulation setting forth a proposed briefing schedule on the merits. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/15/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON THIRD PARTIES. No later than November 17, 2016, Aetna shall file proof of service of its motion to file under seal and this order on each thi rd-party that is the subject of this order. No later than December 1, 2016, any third party wishing to file a declaration establishing the material in question is sealable shall file said declaration. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/7/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The further case management conference is continued to February 17, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/4/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT REPLY MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/19/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING STANDARD OF REVIEW. Plaintiffs are directed to file, no later than September 19, 2016, a table of contents and table of authorities. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/12/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/07/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Plaintiffs' opening brief regarding the standard of review shall be filed on or before August 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' REQUEST TO FILE FULL SCOPE OF EVIDENCE TO BE CONSIDERED BY THE COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS. Defendant shall have up to and including Friday, May 27, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 23, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATION TO FILE EVIDENTIARY RECORD IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT. Given that the circumstances since the filing of the Stipulation have markedly changed, the Stipulation is denied without prejudice to renewal, if appropriate, at a later date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO MOVE APRIL 22, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE. The April 22, 2016 telephonic status conference in the above-captioned action shall be postponed and rescheduled to June 3, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. No later than April 22, 2016, plaintiffs shall file the Third Amended Complaint as a stand-alone entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO SEVER INDIVIDUAL CAUSES OF ACTION. The claims of all plaintiffs in this action except the single claim asserted by the first three named plaintiffs -- Dennis F., Carol F., and Grace F. -- are dismissed without pr ejudice. Within 60 days, plaintiffs shall file eleven separate complaints, each asserting a separate claim for benefits on behalf of the dismissed plaintiffs. The status conference currently set for January 29, 2016, is continued to April 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS BRENDA R. AND BRANDON R. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37. Defendant's motion is granted, and the Court orders that Brenda R. and Brandon R.'s claims against defendant are dismissed in their entirety and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. On November 3, 2015, the above-titled action was reassigned to the undersigned. To facilitate the Court's review of the case, plaintiffs are directed to submit forthwith c hambers copies of the following documents: Complaint, filed May 31, 2012; Amended Complaint, filed January 14, 2013; and Second Amended Complaint, filed February 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. To the extent plaintiffs se ek an order setting a new briefing schedule, the motion is granted, and the current briefing dates are vacated. To the extent plaintiffs seek an order adopting plaintiffs' proposed schedule, the Court defers ruling pending the Case Management Conference, which is advanced from March 18, 2016, to December 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER EXTENDING PARTIES' DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To afford defendant the opportunity to respond to plaintiffs' administrative motion, the parties' deadline to file their respective motions for summary judgment is extended to November 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 131 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 127 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 136 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 134 Stipulation, filed by Aet na Life Insurance Company, 130 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 132 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 133 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 135 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 137 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 129 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 139 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 138 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, 128 Stipulation, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/21/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline for Opening Briefs and Summary Judgment. Cross Motions due by 11/19/2015. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 01/15/2016. Motion Hearing to be noticed for for 03/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/16/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER Setting Amended Briefing Schedule. Cross Motions due by 10/16/2015. Responses due by 11/13/2015. Replies due by 12/4/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/08/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 122 Stipulation (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule. Cross Motions due by 9/10/2015. Responses due by 10/16/2015. Replies due by 11/5/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/20/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Briefing Schedule. Cross Motions due by 5/14/2015. Responses due by 6/24/2015. Replies due by 8/5/2015. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/19/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing Schedules. Cross Motions due by 3/27/2015. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 6/5/2015. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/22/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/28/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/27/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER Contining Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 45 Motion to Certify Class.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing re 45 MOTION to Certify Class . Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/10/2013. (sclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 44 Motion Leave to file overlength memorandum.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule on Motion to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Set Deadlines as to 25 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash. Responses due by 1/21/2013. Replies due by 1/23/2013 by 12:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 21 Stipulation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 20 PETITION FOR ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed by Mindy L.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/11/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 22 Stipulated Protective Order.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/13/12. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Stipulation to continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F. ovo Aetna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis F.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol F.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark P.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mura T.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?