Axis Reinsurance Company v. Telekenex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Axis Reinsurance Company
Defendant: Straitshot RC, LLC, Joy Prudell, Mark Radford, Nikki Radford, Joshua Summers, Julia Summers, IXC Holdings, Inc., Straitshot Communications, Inc., Telekenex, Inc., Anthony Zabit, Karen Salazar, Brandon Chaney, Mark Prudell and Deanna Chaney
Case Number: 3:2012cv02979
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Axis Reinsurance Company against Joshua Summers, Joy Prudell, Julia Summers, Mark Prudell, Mark Radford, Nikki Radford. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/19/2014. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re 128 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Mark Prudell and Joy Prudell filed by Axis Reinsurance Company, 130 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Joshua Summers and Julia Summers filed by Axis Reinsurance Company, 129 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Mark Radford and Nikki Radford filed by Axis Reinsurance Company. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/28/13. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER and Request for Dismissal with Prejudice. Defendants/Counter-Claimants Brandon Chaney, Deanna Chaney, IXC Holdings, Inc.,Karen Salazar, Karen Telekenex, Inc., Anthony Zabit, and Counter-Defendant Axis Reinsurance Company terminated. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Amended ORDER regarding cross-motions for summary judgment.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/10/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER regarding cross-motions for summary judgment.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/10/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Deadlines on Parties' Summary Judgment Motions and Modification of Trial and Discovery Schedule. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Or Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/16/2013. Replies due by 9/30/2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/04/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 94 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b).(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Leave to File.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 83 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order 68 .Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/22/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time For Axis to Respond to Straitshot's Counterclaim to 1/4/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Axis Reinsurance Company to Respond to Straitshot's Counterclaim. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/19/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axis Reinsurance Company v. Telekenex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straitshot RC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Prudell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IXC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straitshot Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telekenex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Zabit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Prudell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axis Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Terrence Reilly McInnis
Represented By: Ross C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?