Bowen v. Access America et al
Plaintiff: Clint Jeffrey Bowen
Defendant: Access America, Mondial Assistance, World Access Service Corporation, BCS Insurance Company, Jefferson Insurance Co., Allianz Insurance Company and AGA Service Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv03083
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/1/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney February 22, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 22, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE FEBRUARY 8, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER. The February 8, 2013 Case Management Conference is continued to March 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 17 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 7, 2012 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 8, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November, 1 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Should Bowen choose to file a First Amended Complaint to cure the deficiencies identified above, he shall file such pleading no later than October 19, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 5, 2012 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED AND/OR A MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Defendants' motion shall be filed by August 1, 2012. Plaintif f's opposition shall be filed by September 11, 2012. Defendants' reply shall be filed by September 18, 2012. The hearing on defendants' motion will be set for October 5, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. The September 21, 2012 Case Management Conference shall be continued to November 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Access America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Jeffrey Bowen
Represented By: Joel H. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access America
Represented By: Alex F. Pevzner
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondial Assistance
Represented By: Alex F. Pevzner
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Access Service Corporation
Represented By: Alex F. Pevzner
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCS Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex F. Pevzner
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Insurance Co.
Represented By: Alex F. Pevzner
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Service Company
Represented By: Alex F. Pevzner
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?