McDowell et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Deborah McDowell and Frank McDowell
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and Municipal Railways
Case Number: 3:2012cv03192
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE MOTION OPPOSING DISMISSAL. Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, DENYING FIFTH MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, GRANTING PLAINTIFFS FINAL OPPORTUNITY TO AMEND AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING SECOND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT DUE TO DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TAKING FIFTH MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL UNDER ADVISEMENT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE REPLY BRIEF TO PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOURTH MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TAKING THIRD MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL UNDER SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Railways
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?