Lazar v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Darryl Lazar
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Barclays Capital Inc., Allen & Company LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Cowen and Company, LLC, E*Trade Securities LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, William Blair & Company, L.L.C. and The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03199
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2012 RECEIPT OF ELECTONIC ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York as case 1:12-cv-07546. Re 120 Order of Transfer (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 120 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 13, 2012 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darryl Lazar re 115 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 10, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983682.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983482.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darryl Lazar re 106 Reply to Opposition/Response, 107 Declaration in Support (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 107 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 106 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byDarryl Lazar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 106 ) (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 106 REPLY (re 31 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) filed byDarryl Lazar. (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 103 Reply to Opposition/Response, 104 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 104 Declaration in Support of 103 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of James F. Basile In Support Of Defendants Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Decision On Transfer By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 103 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 103 REPLY (re 32 MOTION to Stay re 28 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMarc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961839.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darryl Lazar re 88 Opposition/Response to Motion, 98 Declaration in Support (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 98 Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of 88 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDarryl Lazar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 97 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Williams Capital Group, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent The Williams Capital Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Finopco Holdings Co., Other Affiliate David Finkelstein, Other Affiliate Christopher J. Williams, Other Affiliate Bruce Usher, Other Affiliate David Coard, Other Affiliate Jonathan Levin, Other Affiliate DiAnne Calabrisotto for The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 96 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by William Blair & Company, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent WBC Holdings, L.P. for William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 94 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. (NYSE:SF) for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 92 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 90 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 88 RESPONSE (re 32 MOTION to Stay re 28 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byDarryl Lazar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 87 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by Piper Jaffray & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 85 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Crest Securities LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 83 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Pacific Crest Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 82 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 81 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Seibert Financial Corp. for Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 79 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 77 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by M.R. Beal & Company identifying Corporate Parent MRB Securities Corporation, Other Affiliate Bernard Beal for M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 75 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by Loop Capital Markets LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 73 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Loop Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lebenthal & Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alexandra & James LLC for Lebenthal & Co., LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 71 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lebenthal & Co., LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lazard Capital Markets LLC identifying Corporate Parent LFCM Holdings LLC for Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 69 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Itau USA Inc., Corporate Parent Itau Corretora da Valores, S.A., Corporate Parent Itau Unibanco Holding S.A. for Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 67 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent E*Trade Financial Corporation for. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 65 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by E*Trade Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cowen and Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cowen Group, Inc. for Cowen and Company, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 63 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cowen and Company, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities by Castleoak Securities, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent CastleOak Management, LLC, Corporate Parent CastleOak Management Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. for Castleoak Securities, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 61 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Castleoak Securities, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cabrera Capital Inc., Corporate Parent RCF-Cabrera Holdings, Inc. for Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 59 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by C.L. King & Associates, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Candace King Weir, Other Affiliate Amelia Weir, Other Affiliate Katherine Weir for C.L. King & Associates, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 57 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by C.L. King & Associates, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMO Capital Markets Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 55 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blaylock Robert Van LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blaylock & Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Robert Van Securities, Inc. for Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 53 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 51 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G. for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 49 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 47 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 45 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allen & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allen Operations LLC, Corporate Parent Allen Holding Inc. for Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 43 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 41 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 39 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 37 Declaration in Support,, 36 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Certificate of Service of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; Declaration of James F. Basile In Support; [Proposed] Order (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 37 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 36 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMarc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE (re 31 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; [Proposed] Order filed byMarc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6955296.) filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING. All briefing in response to the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 10, 2012, and all reply briefs in support of the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay re 28 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/10/2012. Replies due by 7/18/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 31 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Darryl Lazar. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 3, 2012 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 MOTION to Stay, 29 Amended MOTION to Remand Stipulation Regarding Scheduling filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 29 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Darryl Lazar. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION; filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012)
June 29, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Clubok (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brant Bishop (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Civil Standing Orders (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6919998.) filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6919974.) filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darryl Lazar re 12 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo, 13 Brief, 15 Certificate of Interested Entities, 11 Notice of Appearance, 14 Declaration in Support, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Darryl Lazar (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 14 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 12 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo, 13 Brief filed byDarryl Lazar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 12 , 13 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 13 Brief re 12 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byDarryl Lazar. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Darryl Lazar. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel M. Ward (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 8 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 7 MOTION to Stay OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION filed byMarc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 21 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification Entities or Persons of Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. by Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC re 18 Notice (Other), 19 Notice (Other), (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 19 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities LLC by Facebook, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Defendant Morgan Stanley & Co.LLC. by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Marc L. Andreesen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 514065. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611075445). Filed byDavid M. Spillane, Reed Hastings, Facebook, Inc., David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lazar v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Lazar
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreesen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Robert Van LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. King & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazard Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Company
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Crest Securities LLC
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?