Shierry v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Edward Shierry
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Barclays Capital Inc., Allen & Company LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Cowen and Company, LLC, E*Trade Securities LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P. and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03200
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2012 RECEIPT OF ELECTRONIC ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York as case 1:12-cv-07587. Re 115 Order of Transfer (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC; IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 115 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 13, 2012 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward Shierry re 110 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 111 NOTICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 10, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983724.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983550.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward Shierry re 102 Declaration in Support, 101 Reply to Opposition/Response (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 102 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 101 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byEdward Shierry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 101 REPLY (re 26 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) filed byEdward Shierry. (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 98 Reply to Opposition/Response, 99 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 99 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 98 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of James F. Basile In Support Of Defendants Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Decision On Transfer By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 98 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 98 REPLY (re 27 MOTION to Stay re 22 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961919.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Williams Capital Group, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent The Williams Capital Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Christopher J. Williams, Corporate Parent Finopco Holdings Co., Other Affiliate David Finkelstein, Other Affiliate Bruce Usher, Other Affiliate David Coard, Other Affiliate Jonathan Levin, Other Affiliate DiAnne Calabrisotto for Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 93 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Entities by William Blair & Company, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent WBC Holdings, L.P. for William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 91 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. (NYSE:SF) for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 89 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 88 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 87 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 85 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Piper Jaffray & Co identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 83 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Piper Jaffray & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 82 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Crest Securities LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 81 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Pacific Crest Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 79 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Seibert Financial Corp. for Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 77 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 75 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by M.R. Beal & Company identifying Corporate Parent MRB Securities Corporation, Other Affiliate Bernard Beal for M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 73 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by Loop Capital Markets LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 71 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Loop Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lebenthal & Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alexandra & James LLC for Lebenthal & Co., LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 69 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lebenthal & Co., LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lazard Capital Markets LLC identifying Corporate Parent LFCM Holdings LLC for Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 67 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Itau USA Inc., Corporate Parent Itau Corretora da Valores, S.A., Corporate Parent Itau Unibanco Holding S.A. for Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 65 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent E*Trade Financial Corporation for. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 63 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by ETrade Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cowen and Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cowen Group, Inc. for Cowen and Company, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 61 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cowen and Company, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Castleoak Securities, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent CastleOak Management, LLC, Corporate Parent CastleOak Management Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. for Castleoak Securities, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 59 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Castleoak Securities, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cabrera Capital Inc., Corporate Parent RCF-Cabrera Holdings, Inc. for Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 57 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by C.L. King & Associates, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Amelia Weir, Other Affiliate Katherine Weir, Other Affiliate Candace King Weir for C.L. King & Associates, Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 55 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by C.L. King & Associates, Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMO Capital Markets Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 53 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blaylock Robert Van LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blaylock & Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Robert Van Securities, Inc. for Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 51 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 49 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G. for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 47 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward Shierry re 43 Declaration in Support, 36 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 44 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 43 Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of 36 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEdward Shierry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 41 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allen & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allen Operations LLC, Corporate Parent Allen Holding Inc. for Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 39 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 37 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE (re 27 MOTION to Stay re 22 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byEdward Shierry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 34 Declaration in Support,, 33 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Certificate of Service of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; Declaration of James F. Basile in Support; [Proposed] Order (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 34 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 33 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE (re 26 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; [Proposed] Order filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6955360.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW B. CLUBOK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRANT W. BISHOP PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING. All briefing in response to the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 10, 2012, and all reply briefs in support of the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay re 22 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/10/2012. Replies due by 7/18/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 26 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Edward Shierry. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 3, 2012 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 24 Amended MOTION to Remand , 22 MOTION to Stay Stipulation Regarding Schedule filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 24 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Edward Shierry. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Lionel Z. Glancy (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION; filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012)
June 29, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Standing Order Re: Initial Case Management (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920076.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920070.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 16 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 15 MOTION to Stay OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 14 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward Shierry re 11 Declaration in Support, 12 Certificate of Interested Entities, 10 Brief, 9 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward Shierry (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 11 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 9 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byEdward Shierry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 10 Brief re 9 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byEdward Shierry. (Related document(s) 9 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Edward Shierry. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC re 6 Certificate of Interested Entities, 7 Certificate of Interested Entities (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 7 Notice of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Goldman, Sachs & Co. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 6 Notice of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State Court Action; No Process from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV-514172. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 34611075444). Filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L Andreessen, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Peter A. Thiel, James W. Breyer, David M. Spillane, Facebook, Inc., Erskine B. Bowles. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shierry v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Shierry
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. (sic) Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Robert Van LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. King & Associates, Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazard Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Company
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Crest Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?