Morganti v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Douglas Morganti
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv03511
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer Remanding for Further Administrative Proceedings. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for a Second Extension of Time for Defendant to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Astrue. Reset Deadlines as to 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or remand and proposed order. Responses due by 3/28/2013. Cross Motions due by 3/28/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Astrue. Motions due by 2/28/2013.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Douglas Morganti. Motion(s) due by 1/3/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morganti v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Morganti
Represented By: Pamela R. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Represented By: David William Lerch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?