Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. River View Construction Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: River View Construction Inc. and Gregory Goreshnik
Case Number: 3:2012cv03514
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/15/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/15/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/1/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Case Management Statement,, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/27/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Case Management Statement, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/5/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/7/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. River View Construction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River View Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Goreshnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?