Kramer v. County of Contra Costa
Plaintiff: Gus Kramer
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Case Number: 3:2012cv03604
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Contra Costa. Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2012. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/4/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/19/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/7/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gus Kramer
Represented By: W. Gordon Kaupp
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?