Natividad et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Natividad and Felicisimo M. Natividad
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., First American LoanStar Services, LLC, Newbury Place Reo III, LLC and BSI Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03646
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS PATRICK LYMAN & ASSOCIATES LLC, NEWBURY PLACE REO III, LLC, AND BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/8/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT PARTRICK LYMAN & ASSOCIATES LLC SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Show Cause Response due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/30/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 122 First American's Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Continue January 31, 2013 Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 Stipulation To Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 21, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS re 67 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Felicisimo M. Natividad. Attorney Glenn Lee Moss for Felicisimo M. Natividad, Gloria Natividad added. Attorneys September Joy Katje and Kimberly A Harris Moses terminated. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE NOVEMBER 9, 2012 LETTER FROM GLEN L. MOSS re 52 Letter. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 26, 2012. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 53 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXCUSING WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AND FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC FROM PARTICIPATING IN OCTOBER 22, 2012 ADR TELECONFERENCE; re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 17, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Request To Be Excused From Client Participation by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. At The October 3, 2012 ADR Teleconference filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/2/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/26/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natividad et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Natividad
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicisimo M. Natividad
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Natilee S Riedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American LoanStar Services, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Sperry Mandelin
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newbury Place Reo III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?