Droplets, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Droplets, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc, Apple, Inc., Google Inc., Facebook Inc., Yahoo! Inc. and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv03733
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2012 Filing 139 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:11-cv-00392. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2012 Filing 140 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order All Judges)(dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 12, 2012 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (bas)
July 2, 2012 Filing 138 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 21, 2012, Motion Hearing before Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2012. (Crawford, Libby)
June 29, 2012 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Strike DROPLETS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL DROPLETS TO PROVIDE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS THAT COMPLY WITH PATENT RULE 3-1 filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 84 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/27/12. (bas)
June 25, 2012 Filing 135 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (P.R. 3-3 & 3-4) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 25, 2012 Filing 134 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Disclosure regarding P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (Albritton, Eric)
June 23, 2012 Filing 133 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-5) (Doan, Jennifer)
June 22, 2012 Filing 132 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION for Protective Order REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
June 22, 2012 Filing 131 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ESI ORDER WITH AN ADDITIONAL PARAGRAPH AS DISCUSSED AT THE MARCH 29, 2012 SCHEDULING HEARING filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 21, 2012 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2012 re 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (lfs, )
June 20, 2012 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
June 18, 2012 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Strike DROPLETS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL DROPLETS TO PROVIDE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS THAT COMPLY WITH PATENT RULE 3-1 filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 11, 2012 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION for Protective Order REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 11, 2012 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ESI ORDER WITH AN ADDITIONAL PARAGRAPH AS DISCUSSED AT THE MARCH 29, 2012 SCHEDULING HEARING filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Stevenson, Theodore)
June 6, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D Rowland on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Rowland, Mark)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 118 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/4/12. (bas)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven and ORDERS that plaintiff file a response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Thursday, June 14, 2012 at 5:00 pm.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/4/2012. (sm, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 122 RESPONSE to Motion re 112 MOTION for Protective Order REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Amazon and Facebook, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Apple, Google and Yahoo!, # 3 Exhibit 1 - PO with all proposals, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Table of proposals)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 1, 2012 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ESI ORDER WITH AN ADDITIONAL PARAGRAPH AS DISCUSSED AT THE MARCH 29, 2012 SCHEDULING HEARING filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (version 1), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (version 2))(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 31, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren S Heit on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Heit, Warren)
May 31, 2012 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Expedite Regarding Dkt #117 filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 30, 2012 Filing 118 MOTION to Expedite Regarding Dkt #117 by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 30, 2012 Filing 117 MOTION to Strike DROPLETS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL DROPLETS TO PROVIDE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS THAT COMPLY WITH PATENT RULE 3-1 by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin McGann, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order, # 14 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 22, 2012 Filing 116 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Helena D Kiepura for Facebook, Inc (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-9742) (bsw, )
May 22, 2012 Filing 115 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Corey J Manley for Facebook, Inc.. (pkb, )
May 22, 2012 Filing 114 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J John Lee for Facebook, Inc.. (pkb, )
May 22, 2012 Filing 113 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregg F LoCascio for Facebook, Inc.. (pkb, )
May 14, 2012 Filing 112 MOTION for Protective Order REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed protective order up to and including Monday, May 14, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/14/2012. (sm, )
May 14, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ESI ORDER WITH AN ADDITIONAL PARAGRAPH AS DISCUSSED AT THE MARCH 29, 2012 SCHEDULING HEARING by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 11, 2012 Filing 109 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed protective order until May 11, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/7/2012. (sm, )
May 4, 2012 Filing 107 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 4, 2012 Filing 106 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed protective order until 5/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/30/2012. (sm, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 23, 2012 Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion re 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Clements, Matthew)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2013., Discovery due by 7/12/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 9/7/2012., Mediation Completion due by 8/9/2013.), (Markman Hearing set for 12/6/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.) Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/23/12. (mrm, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 101 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File through and includng April 27, 2012 to file their proposed protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/20/2012. (sm, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 29, 2012, Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2012. (Crawford, Libby)
April 19, 2012 Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 12, 2012 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1a, # 2 Exhibit 1b, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed orders up to and including April 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/9/2012. (sm, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
April 6, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Batchelder, James)
April 6, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Facebook, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Keefe, Heidi)
April 6, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures) (Doan, Jennifer)
April 6, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com, Inc. - Notice of Initial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle)
April 6, 2012 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and Docket Control Order by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 6, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Droplets, Inc. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 4, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC re 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 29, 2012 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Scheduling Conference and discovery dispute hearing held on 3/29/2012. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (lfs, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STANDARD PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/29/2012. (sm, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY in PATENT CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/29/2012. (sm, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit I, # 16 Exhibit J, # 17 Exhibit K, # 18 Exhibit L, # 19 Exhibit M, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit O, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Batchelder, James)
March 22, 2012 Filing 83 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Doan, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 9, 2012 NOTICE of HEARING re: Discovery Disputes as addressesd in #82 Order set for 03/29/12 at 10:00 a.m., U. S. District Court, Texarkana, TX before U. S. Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven. (lfs, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER regarding scheduling conference deadlines. (Markman Hearing set for 12/6/2012 09:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/7/12. (ehs, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 81 ANSWER to 71 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Droplets, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 27, 2012 Filing 80 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to File their joint conference report. Parties shall have additional time, through and including Monday, February 27, 2012, to file their joint conference report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/27/12. (ehs, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 78 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Conference Report by Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Droplets, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of Honorable Michael Schneider. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (sm, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER - even though the 2/27/2012 management conference with Judge Folsom has been cancelled, the parties are still expected to file with the court their Joint Conference Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/22/2012. (ch, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (ch, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER; The Scheduling Conferences previously set in the above-captioned cases for February 27, 2012, are hereby CANCELLED to be reset for a date to be determined by the Court. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/12. (mrm, )
February 22, 2012 Judge Michael H. Schneider added as presiding judge. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (sm, )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER; granting 72 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/13/12. (mrm, )
February 10, 2012 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 10, 2012 Filing 71 Yahoo! Inc.'s ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Droplets, Inc. by Yahoo! Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
February 8, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE of Change of Address by Deron R Dacus (Dacus, Deron)
February 7, 2012 Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer H Wu for Yahoo! Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-902) (ehs, )
February 7, 2012 Filing 68 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin A Wiggins for Yahoo! Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-902)(ehs, )
February 7, 2012 Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Ball, Jr for Yahoo! Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-11-392) (ehs, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric E Lancaster on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Lancaster, Eric)
January 27, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeannine Y Sano on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Sano, Jeannine)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2012 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 6, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 6, 2012 At the direction of the presiding Judge this case is hereby transferred to Judge David Folsom per instruction of Judge Gilstrap (ehs, )
December 27, 2011 Filing 62 ANSWER to 48 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Droplets, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 27, 2011 Filing 61 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 22, 2011 Filing 60 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc A Cavan for Apple, Inc.,Marc A Cavan for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-851) (ehs, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James R Batchelder for Apple, Inc.,James R Batchelder for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-851) (ehs, )
December 20, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Clements on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Clements, Matthew)
December 15, 2011 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
December 7, 2011 Filing 56 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Padro for Google Inc.,John Padro for YouTube, LLC.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-829) (ehs, )
December 7, 2011 Filing 55 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leon Miniovich for Google Inc.,Leon Miniovich for YouTube, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-839) (ehs, )
December 7, 2011 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin X McGann for Google Inc.,Kevin X McGann for YouTube, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-839) (ehs, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Whealan on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Whealan, John)
December 5, 2011 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 2, 2011 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 2, 2011 Filing 50 ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
December 2, 2011 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
December 2, 2011 Filing 48 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Droplets, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
December 2, 2011 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
December 2, 2011 Filing 46 ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle)
December 2, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
December 2, 2011 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for YouTube, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 2, 2011 Filing 43 ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint by YouTube, LLC.(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 2, 2011 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 2, 2011 Filing 41 ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint by Google Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief Responses due by 12/5/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/2011. (ch, )
November 23, 2011 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Facebook, Inc.s deadline is 12/2/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/16/2011. (ch, )
November 16, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Facebook, Inc. to 12/2/2011. (ch, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 23 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Apple Inc deadline is 12/2/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, )
November 14, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple, Inc. to 12/2/2011. (ch, )
November 11, 2011 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Original Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 10, 2011 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 9, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Quigley on behalf of Droplets, Inc. (Quigley, James)
November 7, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or, Alternatively, to Certify Under 28 USC § 1292(b) and Supporting Brief by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Shropshire Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B - Robison Declaration)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 7, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey A Lamken on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Vincent Totaro on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Totaro, Martin)
November 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 12/2/2011. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
November 2, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell A Korn on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Korn, Russell)
November 2, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle)
November 2, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William H Boice on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Boice, William)
November 1, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alexander Latchford on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Latchford, Shawn)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Google and YouTubes response to the Second Amended Complaint will be December 2. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/18/2011. (ch, )
October 14, 2011 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) against Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC, filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stevenson, Theodore)
October 14, 2011 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
October 13, 2011 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Droplets, Inc.. YouTube, LLC served on 9/29/2011 to Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent designated by law to accerpt service of process on behalf of Corporation Service Co, answer due 11/14/2011. (ehs, )
October 12, 2011 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Droplets, Inc.. Apple, Inc. served on 9/23/2011, answer due 11/14/2011; Yahoo! Inc. served on 9/27/2011, answer due 11/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Yahoo!)(ehs, )
October 12, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 11/17/2011. 34 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint. Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube, LLCs answer deadline extended to 11/14/11. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/11/11. (ehs, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint [Dkt. #2] re Facebook, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
October 11, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 11/14/2011; YouTube, LLC to 11/14/2011. (ehs, )
October 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 11/17/2011. 35 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 10, 2011 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Amended Complaint by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 10, 2011 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
October 10, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
October 7, 2011 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
October 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 11/17/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MISC 11-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (poa, )
October 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 11/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Albritton, Eric)
October 4, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
September 30, 2011 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Droplets, Inc.. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011; Google Inc. served on 9/23/2011, answer due 10/14/2011. Defts served through Registered Agents (Attachments: # 1 Google)(ehs, )
September 29, 2011 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Droplets, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. served on 9/23/2011 through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 10/14/2011. (ehs, )
September 21, 2011 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Apple, # 2 Facebook, # 3 Google, # 4 Yahoo!, # 5 YouTube)(ehs, )
September 20, 2011 Filing 7 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 19, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon M Jordan on behalf of Droplets, Inc. (Jordan, Brandon)
September 18, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 15, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Wright Budwin on behalf of Droplets, Inc. (Budwin, Joshua)
September 15, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Droplets, Inc. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 11, 2011 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC, filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stevenson, Theodore)
September 8, 2011 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
September 8, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com, Inc., Apple, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3212761.), filed by Droplets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Droplets, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Droplets, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Joshua Wright Budwin
Represented By: Brandon M Jordan
Represented By: James E Quigley
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: William Boice
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Russell Adam Korn
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Represented By: E Danielle Thompson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: James R. Batchelder
Represented By: Marc A. Cavan
Represented By: Matthew R Clements
Represented By: Matthew R Clements
Represented By: Mark Daniel Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Warren S. Heit
Represented By: Eric Edmund Lancaster
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Leon Miniovich
Represented By: John Padro
Represented By: Jeannine Yoo Sano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Helena D Kiepura
Represented By: J John Lee
Represented By: Gregg LoCascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: David J. Ball, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Lamken
Represented By: Shawn Alexander Latchford
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: John M Whealan
Represented By: Erin A Wiggins
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Warren S. Heit
Represented By: Eric Edmund Lancaster
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Leon Miniovich
Represented By: John Padro
Represented By: Jeannine Yoo Sano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?