U.A. Local 342 Joint Labor-Management Committee et al v. Ipurity, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.A. Local 342 Joint Labor-Management Committee, Northern California Pipe Trades Pension Trust, Northern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust, Local Union 342, Plumbers & Steamfitters, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO), U.A. Local 342 Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund and James Williams
Defendant: Ipurity, Inc. and Kurt Gilson
Case Number: 3:2012cv03779
Filed: July 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Kurt Gilson in the amount of $259,297.55 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Ipurity, Inc., in the amount of $259,297.55 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Local Union 342, Plumbers & Steamfitters, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO), Northern California Pipe Trades Health a nd Welfare Trust, Northern California Pipe Trades Pension Trust, U.A. Local 342 Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, U.A. Local 342 Joint Labor-Management Committee, James Williams against iPurity, Inc., Kurt Gilson. 1. Plaintiffs are entitled to co ntributions in the amount of $119,516.35.2. Plaintiffs are entitled to liquidated damages in the amount of $110,861.29.3. Plaintiffs are entitled to prejudgment interest in the amount of $19,804.91.4. Plaintiffs are awarded the sum of $9,115.00 in attorneys fees, which fees the Court finds were reasonably incurred.Accordingly, plaintiffs shall have judgment against defendants in the amount of $259,297.55. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 28, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 1, 2013 is continued to May 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION(S). Defendants may file supplemental declarations no later than February 22, 2013, at which time the Court will take the matter under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013) .
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs are ordered file, no later than January 11, 2013, a motion for default judgment or statement indicating why they should not be required to do so. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 30, 2012 to March 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.A. Local 342 Joint Labor-Management Committee et al v. Ipurity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local 342 Joint Labor-Management Committee
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Sonya Michlin Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Pipe Trades Pension Trust
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Sonya Michlin Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Sonya Michlin Gordon
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 342, Plumbers & Steamfitters, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO)
Represented By: Sonya Michlin Gordon
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local 342 Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Sonya Michlin Gordon
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Williams
Represented By: Sonya Michlin Gordon
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipurity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Gilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?