Craigslist, Inc v. 3Taps, Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc
Defendant: 3Taps, Inc, Padmapper, Inc., Brian R. Niessen, Discover Home Network, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Lovely, Hard Yaka, Inc. and Robert G. Kidd
Interested Party: LinkedIn Corporation
Amicus Curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Case Number: 3:2012cv03816
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 REPORT on the termination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Denying #294 Administrative Motion. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 DECLARATION OF THOMAS V. CHRISTOPHER IN SUPPORT OF #295 3TAPS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO LINKEDIN'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD NE RELATED UNDER N.D. CAL. CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (PLEASE USE THIS VERSION) filed by3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/21/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #297 *** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #294 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES ) DECLARATION OF THOMAS V. CHRISTOPHER IN SUPPORT OF 3TAPS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO LINKEDIN'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD NE RELATED UNDER N.D. CAL. CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (Replacement) filed by3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/21/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #294 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES ) 3TAPS, INC'S OPPOSITION TO LINKEDIN'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED UNDER N.D. CAL. CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 filed by3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed by LinkedIn Corporation. Responses due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Blavin In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Craigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 6/29/2017) Modified on 6/29/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #289 Administrative Motion to relate case 16-cv-1856WHO to 12-cv-3816CRB. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry in Support of #289 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #289 ) (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Craigslist, Inc. Responses due by 4/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Change of Address by Venkat Balasubramani (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #282 Motion For Limited Relief From Certain Requirements Of The Stipulated Protective Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 RESPONSE (re #282 MOTION For Limited Relief From Certain Requirements Of The Stipulated Protective Order ) STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION OF 3TAPS, INC., HARD YAKA, INC., ROBERT G. KIDD, and DISCOVER HOME NETWORK, INC. d/b/a LOVELY TO CRAIGSLIST, INC.S MOTION FOR LIMITED RELIEF FROM CERTAIN REQUIREMENTS OF THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Motion Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Limited Relief (Dkt. No. #282 ) currently scheduled before the Honorable Charles B. Breyer is advanced to February 11, 2016 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CORLEY signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #282 MOTION For Limited Relief From Certain Requirements Of The Stipulated Protective Order . Responses due by 1/21/2016. Replies due by 1/28/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 2/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry in Support of #282 MOTION For Limited Relief From Certain Requirements Of The Stipulated Protective Order filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #282 ) (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION For Limited Relief From Certain Requirements Of The Stipulated Protective Order filed by Craigslist, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/21/2016. Replies due by 1/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
October 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Granting Application for Default Judgment by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2015. re #277 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Brian Niessen filed by Craigslist, Inc. Motion for default judgment granted. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina. Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Barry. Defendant Attorney: No appearance. This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Declaration of William C. Powell in Support of #277 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Brian Niessen filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #277 ) (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry in Support of #277 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Brian Niessen filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #277 ) (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Brian Niessen filed by Craigslist, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/15/2015. Replies due by 9/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brian Niessen. (Related documents(s) #275 )(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Brian Niessen filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Brian Niessen by Craigslist, Inc . (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/4/2015) Modified on 8/5/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #269 Stipulation for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against (1) 3Taps, Inc., (2) Hard Yaka, Inc., and (3) Robert G. Kidd (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #270 Stipulation for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against PadMapper, Inc (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against PadMapper, Inc. filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against (1) 3Taps, Inc., (2) Hard Yaka, Inc., and (3) Robert G. Kidd filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 6/24/2015. Case settled.FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 6/23/2015. Further Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Jennifer Barry & David Troutman. Defendant Attorney Abraham A. Tabaie, David Hansen & James Schaefer - Dft 3Taps; Venkat Balasubramani - Dft Padmapper. This is a text only Minute Entry (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 6/18/2015. Further Settlement Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Padmapper, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Letter from Robert J. Ellison to Court re: Correction to Docket Nos. 251 and 253. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Robert J. Ellison)(Ellison, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Hearing Date Concerning PadMapper's Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Supplemental Briefing filed by Craigslist, Inc. Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 PadMapper's Supplement Brief due by 6/19/2015, Craiglist's Supplemental Responses due by 7/2/2015. PadMapper's Replies due by 7/10/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer finding as moot #240 Stipulation; granting #258 Stipulation Modifying Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #234 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating the hearing currently set for June 12, 2015 at 10:00 am before Judge Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Hearing Date Concerning PadMapper's Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Supplemental Briefing filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Settlement Conference previously scheduled for May 28, 2015 at 9:30 A.M., has been rescheduled for June 18, 2015, at 9:30 A.M., in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. Lead trial counsel who will try the case shall appear at the Settlement Conference with the parties and with the person(s) having full authority to negotiate and to settle the case. All other provisions of this Court's original Notice and Settlement Conference Order shall remain in effect. The parties shall notify Magistrate Judge JOSEPH C. SPERO s chambers immediately at (415) 522-3691 if this case settles prior to the date set for settlement conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: TelephonicScheduling Conference held on 5/21/2015. Settlement conference set for 5/28/15 at 9:30 AM is rescheduled to 6/18/15 at 9:30 AM. All other provisions of this Court's original Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference shall remain in effect #229 FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Jennifer Barry, Michael J. Reiss (T)*. Defendant Attorney Jack DiCanio, James Patrick Schaefer - Dft 3Taps; Sean M. McChesney - Dft Padmapper, Inc. (T)*= Telephonic AppearanceThis is a text only Minute Entry (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craigslist, Inc re #254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Ellison, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robert J. Ellison in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit Ellison Declaration Exhibit E Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Ellison Declaration Exhibit H Filed Under Seal)(Ellison, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Declaration of Robert J. Ellison in Support of #251 Reply to Opposition/Response, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CRAIGSLIST, INC.'S CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Ellison, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry in Support of #251 Reply to Opposition/Response, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CRAIGSLIST, INC.'S CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Related document(s) #251 ) (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 REPLY (re #234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) PLAINTIFF CRAIGSLIST INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS TO CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani in Support of #249 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #249 ) (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 RESPONSE (re #234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 16, 2015, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #246 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2015. (Related documents(s) #246 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Padmapper, Inc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #241 Stipulation regarding briefing schedule for motion for leave (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Deadlines as to #234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Responses due by 5/14/2015. Replies due by 5/21/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE (re #234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byHard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Schaefer, #2 Proposed Order)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Reiss (Reiss, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Hansen (Hansen, David) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Maben Hammon (Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Schaefer (Schaefer, James) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #235 Stipulation MODIFYING DEADLINE FOR BRINGING DISCOVERY MOTIONS (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Renotice motion hearing re #234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byCraigslist, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/14/2015. Replies due by 5/21/2015. (Related document(s) #234 ) (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MODIFYING DEADLINE FOR BRINGING DISCOVERY MOTIONS filed by 3Taps, Inc, Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Craigslist, Inc. Motion hearing set for 5/29/15 at 10:00 am before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment A to Third Amended Complaint, #3 Attachment B to Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Redline of Third Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Order)(Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 4/24/2015) Modified on 4/27/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Order, signed as modified on 4/23/14 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #232 Stipulation Modifying Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference re-set for 5/28/15 at 9:30 AM(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing re #233 Order on Stipulation Settlement Conference re-set for 5/28/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by 3Taps, Inc, Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/13/2015. (FTR Time 11:02-11:09) Plaintiff Attorneys: Jennifer Barry; Robert Ellison. Defendant Attorneys: Abraham Tabaie & James Schafer for 3Taps, Inc.; Venkat Balasubramani for Padmapper, Inc.. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2015)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Letter from Jennifer L. Barry re: Order Following Discovery Hearing . (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/6/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015) Modified on 4/6/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 4/4/2015)
April 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/02/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 9:03 a.m. - 9:57 a.m. = 54 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 4/4/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Letter from Jack P. DiCanio re: Order Following Discovery Hearing. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against: Discovery Home Network, Inc. d/b/a Lovely by Judge Charles R. Breyer Re: #220 Stipulation for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley terminating #218 Discovery Letter Brief and #219 Discovery Letter Brief. (jsclc1 COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 4/2/2015. (FTR 9:03-9:57)Plaintiff Attorneys: Jennifer Barry; Andrew Gass. Defendant Attorneys: Abraham Tabaie & James Schafer for 3Taps, Inc.; Venkat Balasubramani & Sean McChesney via Court Call for Padmapper, Inc.. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2015) Modified on 4/2/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Discover Home Network, Inc. d/b/a Lovely filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Discovery Letter Brief re: Server Harm filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Second Discovery Letter Brief RE: Server Harm filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #216 Stipulation EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING THEIR DISPUTE REGARDING SOURCE CODE-RELATED INFORMATION (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING THEIR DISPUTE REGARDING SOURCE CODE-RELATED INFORMATION filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Troutman, David) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT ROBERT G. KIDD'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO C #147 RAIGSLIST'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT byRobert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT HARD YAKA, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO #147 CRAIGSLIST'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT byHard Yaka, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT DISCOVER HOME NETWORK, INC. D/B/A LOVELY'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO #147 CRAIGSLIST'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT byDiscover Home Network, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT 3TAPS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO #147 CRAIGSLIST'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by3Taps, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the discovery hearing currently scheduled for April 2, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. shall commence at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/26/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. SEALED PORTION. FTR 2:07 p.m. - 2:16 p.m. = 9 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/26/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. NON-SEALED PORTION. FTR 1:58 p.m. - 2:06 p.m. and 2:17 p.m. - 2:53 p.m.= 44 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #203 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 03/19/15, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:05 - 3:09. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #204 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2015. (Related documents(s) #204 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #200 Stipulation RE: Server Harm Extending Page Limits (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answers)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 3/19/2015. Parties shall submit a joint discovery letter by 3/30/2015. Further Discovery Hearing set for 4/2/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (FTR Time 2:05-3:09) Plaintiff Attorneys: Andrew Gass; Jennifer Barry. Defendant Attorneys: Abraham Tabaie & James Schafer for 3Taps, Inc.; Venkat Balasubramani & Sean McChesney via Court Call for Padmapper, Inc. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Letter from PadMapper, Inc. Defendants' Letter Briefs re Discovery Issues. (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #199 Discovery Letter Brief RE: Server Harm Extending Page Limits filed by 3Taps, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Discovery Letter Brief RE: Server Harm filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd, Padmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Klausner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Declaration of James Buckmaster, #11 Exhibit 1)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Discovery Letter Brief RE: Robert G. Kidd's - AEO Designated Discovery filed by Robert G. Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Discovery Letter BriefRE: craigslist's Financials filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd, Padmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Discovery Letter BriefRE: Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd, Padmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 2/26/2015. Further Discovery Hearing set for 3/19/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (FTR 1:58-2:06; 2:07-2:16 (Sealed); 2:17-2:53) ***Transcipt may be released to parties that were present at the hearing.***Plaintiff Attorneys: Andrew Gass; Robert Ellison. Defendant Attorneys: Abraham Tabaie & James Schafer for 3Taps, Inc.; Venkat Balasubramani & Sean McChesney via Court Call for Padmapper, Inc. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2015) Modified on 2/27/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/2/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Transcript of the Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on February 12, 2015, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Carrie McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897; mckee-parks65@att.net. FTR 10:03-10:54. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2015. (cmp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Padmapper, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 2/14/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER CLARIFYING DISCOVERY DISPUTE PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/12/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 2/12/2015. Discovery Hearing set for 2/26/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.( FTR Time 10:03-10:54.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc., Hard Yaka, Inc., Robert G. Kidd for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/05/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 2:03 p.m. - 3:08 p.m. = 65 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Ellison (Ellison, Robert) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by David Dean Troutman (Troutman, David) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 2/5/2015. Discovery Hearing set for 2/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR Time 2:03-3:08. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Barry (Barry, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Amended ANSWER to #147 Second Amended Complaint byHard Yaka, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Amended ANSWER to #147 Second Amended Complaint byRobert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Amended ANSWER to #147 Second Amended Complaint byDiscover Home Network, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Amended ANSWER to #147 Second Amended Complaint by3Taps, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Gass (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for February 5, 2015 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. All counsel must appear in person. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding document discovery disputes with (1) craigslist's production and (2) 3taps' and Lovely's Production filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abraham Tabaie with Exhibits A-H, #2 Declaration of Brian Hennessy with Exhibits A-C)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Esther Silverman (Silverman, Karen) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry Joseph Viscounty (Viscounty, Perry) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2015 re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Padmapper, Inc. Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) is granted. Supplemental Responses due by 6/24/2015. Supplemental Replies due by 6/29/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.Court Reporter: Belle Ball.Plaintiff Attorney Patrick Corrigan, Bobbie Wilson, Brian Hennessy.Defendant Attorney Venkat Balasubramani, Sean McChesney, Abraham Tabaie. This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/16/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Robert G. Kidd's Answer to #147 Second Amended Complaint byRobert G. Kidd. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/13/2015) Modified on 1/14/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Hard Yaka, Inc.'s Answer to #147 Second Amended Complaint byHard Yaka, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/13/2015) Modified on 1/14/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Discover Home Network, Inc., d/b/a Lovely's Answer to #147 Second Amended Complaint byDiscover Home Network, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/13/2015) Modified on 1/14/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant 3taps, Inc.'s Answer to #147 Second Amended Complaint by3Taps, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/13/2015) Modified on 1/14/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY (re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 ) Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Sur-Reply in Response to PadMapper, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 STIPULATION Extending Time and Setting a Schedule for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to craigslist, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint. If motion to dismiss is filed responses due by 2/10/2015. Replies due by 2/23/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time and Setting a Schedule for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to craigslist, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 RESPONSE (re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 ) filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #2 Exhibits 1-3 ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #3 Exhibits 4-5 ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #4 Exhibits 6-14 ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #5 Exhibits 15-24 ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ)(Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani in Support of #158 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #158 ) (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPLY (re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 ) filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #152 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE (re #152 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Corrigan, James) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Second Amended Complaint summons Issued as to Robert G. Kidd. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Second Amended Complaint summons Issued as to Hard Yaka, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani in Support of #152 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Related document(s) #152 ) (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craigslist, Inc re #148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Declaration of William C. Powell in Support of #148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ISO craigslist's Opposition to PadMapper's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #148 ) (Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Proposed Order re #148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Denying PadMapper's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment) by Craigslist, Inc. (Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #6 Redacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 1-3, #7 Redacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 4-5, #8 Redacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 6-14, #9 Redacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 15-24, #10 Unredacted Version of Declaration ISO Opposition to PadMapper's MSJ, #11 Unredacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 1-3, #12 Unredacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 4-5, #13 Unredacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 6-14, #14 Unredacted Version of Declaration ISO Exhibits 15-24)(Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND - UNREDACTED) against All Defendants. Filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #143 STIPULATION re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 filed by Padmapper, Inc., Reset Hearing as to #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 , #143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 . Motion Hearing reset for 1/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #142 Stipulation /ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO CRAIGSLIST INC.S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO CRAIGSLIST INC.S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc.. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Nancy Cheng for Plaintiff craigslist, Inc. (Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Cheng for Plaintiff craigslist, Inc. (Cheng, Nancy) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #138 filed by Padmapper, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 11/12/2014. Replies due by 11/26/2014. (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Padmapper, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 11/12/2014. Replies due by 11/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 10/4/2014) Modified on 10/7/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Request for Judicial Notice filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Declaration of Eric DeMenthon filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 O)(McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Proposed Summons. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Proposed Summons. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/26/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/26/2014). Discovery by 4/20/2015. Expert Disclosure by 5/29/2015. Expert Discovery by 7/31/2015. Motions by 8/31/2015.(Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [130-1] Declaration in support, Unredacted version of Second Amended Complaint by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal craigslist's Second Amended Complaint filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of craigslist, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of craigslist, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION RE FILING OF CRAIGSLIST, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting Motion : #125 STIPULATION SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PADMAPPER, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ENLARGING THE PAGE LIMIT filed by Craigslist, Inc. Set Deadlines/SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PADMAPPER, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ENLARGING THE PAGE LIMIT. SJ Motion due by 10/3/2014 - page limit 40 pages. Responses due by 11/12/2014 - page limit 40 pages. Replies due by 11/26/2014, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Certificate of Interested Entities by Discover Home Network, Inc. SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 3-15 identifying other affiliate RentPath Inc. for Discover Home Network, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 9/17/2014) Modified on 9/18/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PADMAPPER, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ENLARGING THE PAGE LIMIT filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 CLERKS NOTICE (text entry only, no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #121 Discovery Letter Brief/Request to take 1/23/14 hearing off calendar. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by 3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation), Discover Home Network, Inc. (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 1/21/2014) Modified on 1/22/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by 3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation), Discover Home Network, Inc.. (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Recording held on 12/12/13, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, Telephone number 415-994-5619, e-mail: candace.yount@gmail.com. Tape Number: 2:00 - 3:13. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2014. (Related documents(s) #118 , #119 ) (Yount, Candace) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc, Discover Home Network, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER (Dkt. No. 109). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley om 12/13/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/12/2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 12/13/2013). (FTR Recording 2:00-3:13) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #114 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Discovery Hearing (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Discovery Hearing filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (S M McChesney) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8213152.) filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing)(McChesney, Sean) (Filed on 12/6/2013) Modified on 12/9/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Letter from Brian P. Hennessy on behalf of Plaintiff craigslist, Inc. to Judge Corley. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CLERKS NOTICE setting discovery hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for December 12, 2013 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abraham Tabaie in Support of Joint Statement, #2 Declaration of Lauren Cohen in Support of Joint Statement, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lauren Cohen in Support of Joint Statement, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lauren Cohen in Support of Joint Statement, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Lauren Cohen in Support of Joint Statement)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting #107 Stipulation and referring case to Magistrate Judge Corley for discovery matters.(crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting That Case Be Referred to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery Matters filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Letter from Brian P. Hennessy and Jack P. DiCanio to Judge Breyer re discovery disputes. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #104 Stipulated Protective Order (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-9-13, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2013. (Related documents(s) #100 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION 13 AND 15 IN PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/16/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Entry: Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on 8/9/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/9/2013). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY re #48 Motion to Dismiss, DEFENDANT 3TAPS, INC.'S REPLY RE: MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION NOS. 13 AND 14 IN PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack DiCanio, #2 Exhibit A-H)(Related document(s) #89 ) (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 7/12/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CRAIGSLIST, INC.S OPPOSITION TO #89 RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS; #92 MOTION TO BRIEF BY AMICI CURIE by Craigslist, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Renewed Motion to Dismiss)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 7/2/2013) Modified on 7/3/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham A. Tabaie (Tabaie, Abraham) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Answer to #35 Amended Complaint DEFENDANT DISCOVER HOME NETWORK, INC. D/B/A LOVELYS ANSWER TO CRAIGSLISTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byDiscover Home Network, Inc. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Answer to #35 Amended Complaint DEFENDANT 3TAPS, INC.S ANSWER TO CRAIGSLISTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 7/2/2013. Replies due by 7/12/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting #92 Motion for Leave to File and Approving #90 Stipulation to Revise Briefing Schedule.(crblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Response to the Court's Request for Supplemental Briefing filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Amici Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Fakhoury, Hanni) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanni Meena Fakhoury (Fakhoury, Hanni) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Revising Briefing Schedule filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Supplemental Brief re #48 Motion to Dismiss filed by3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation), Discover Home Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack P. DiCanio, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-L, #3 Proposed Order) (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 26, 2013, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2013. (Related documents(s) #84 ) (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION to extend time for defendants to asnwer complaint filed by 3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation), Discover Home Network, Inc.. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/24/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 5/24/2013). Motions due by 6/7/2013. Responses due by 6/21/2013. Replies due by 6/28/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2013 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Craigslist, Inc for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by 3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation), Discover Home Network, Inc. for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Keyte, James) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by Discover Home Network, Inc. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3-16 (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Patrick DiCanio on behalf of Lovely (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #77 Stipulation (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #75 Motion to Appear by Telephone (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christopher J. Bakes and Locke Lord LLP (Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Craigslist, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Page Limit of Joint Case Management Statement filed by Craigslist, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Patrick DiCanio (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part #46 #48 #50 Motions to Dismiss; granting #61 Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Discovery. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/26/2013) re #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Padmapper, Inc., #61 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by Craigslist, Inc, #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 3Taps, Inc. (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick Hennessy of Geraldine M. Alexis (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (craigslist, Inc.) (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by 3TAPS, INC. (Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text entry, no document associated with this entry). Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). Reset Hearing as to #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #61 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims, #48 MOTION to Dismiss , #50 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing reset for 4/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY (re #61 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims ) filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims ) filed by3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims ) filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Joinder by Padmapper, Inc. re #62 Reply to Opposition/Response . (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 2/13/2013) Modified on 2/14/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY (re #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Request for Judicial Notice re #62 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION 4, 5, 6, 13 AND 14 filed by3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Document 1 - Article at httpswww.eff.orgdeeplinks201208good-news-craigslist-drops-exclusive-license-your-posts, #2 Exhibit Document 2 - Fact Sheet at httpwww.craigslist.orgaboutfactsheet)(Related document(s) #62 ) (Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss ) CAUSES OF ACTION 4, 5, 6, 13 AND 14 filed by3Taps, Inc. (Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by Craigslist, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 2/22/2013. Replies due by 3/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE (re #48 MOTION to Dismiss , #50 MOTION to Dismiss ) craigslist, Inc.'s Opposition to 3Taps, Inc.'s and Discovery Home Network, Inc.'s Limited Motion to Dismiss Causes of Action 4, 5, 13 and 14 filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Kao, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E1, #7 Exhibit E2, #8 Exhibit E3, #9 Exhibit E4, #10 Exhibit E5, #11 Exhibit F1 (Part 1), #12 Exhibit F1 (Part 2), #13 Exhibit F1 (Part 3), #14 Exhibit F1 (Part 4), #15 Exhibit F2, #16 Exhibit F3 (Part 1), #17 Exhibit F3 (Part 2), #18 Exhibit F4, #19 Exhibit F5, #20 Exhibit F6, #21 Exhibit G, #22 Exhibit H, #23 Exhibit I, #24 Exhibit J, #25 Exhibit K, #26 Exhibit L, #27 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE (re #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss ) craigslist, Inc.'s Opposition to PadMapper, Inc.'s Limited Motion to Dismiss filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian P. Hennessy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER TO #47 COUNTERCLAIM Plaintif craigslist, Inc.'s Answer to 3Taps, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER TO #44 COUNTERCLAIM Plaintiff craigslist, Inc.'s Answer to PadMapper, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim byCraigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing as to #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #48 MOTION to Dismiss , #50 MOTION to Dismiss . Motions to Dismiss Hearing reset for 3/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, Set the Briefing Schedule on craigslist's Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims, and Continue the Case Managemen filed by Craigslist, Inc.Reset Hearing as to #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #48 MOTION to Dismiss , #50 MOTION to Dismiss
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, Set the Briefing Schedule on craigslist's Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims, and Continue the Case Management Conference filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian P. Hennessy in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, Set the Briefing Schedule on craigslist's Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Amended Counterclaims, and Continue the Case Management Conference)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (S R Alfonso) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7369042.) filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alfonso, Shylah) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Padmapper, Inc. re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Joinder (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 12/24/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Discover Home Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Discover Home Network, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by 3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 3Taps, Inc(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Bakes, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Amended COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant 3Taps, Inc. against Craigslist, Inc(a Delaware corporation). Filed by3Taps, Inc. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Padmapper, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/31/2013. Replies due by 2/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byPadmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Craigslist, Inc. Filed byPadmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CRAIGSLISTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESPOND TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Amended Complaint or Amendments to Counterclaims due by 12/21/2012. Responses (mtn to dismiss) 1/31/2013. Replies due by 2/13/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CRAIGSLISTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESPOND TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani)(Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance Craigslist, Inc(a Delaware corporation) of Bobbie J. Wilson (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Brian R. Niessen. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 First Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Discover Home Network, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance Craigslist, Inc of Jason Yurasek (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Plaintiff craigslist, Inc.'s ANSWER to #20 Counterclaim of Defendant 3Taps, Inc. byCraigslist, Inc. (Kao, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/21/2012 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Plaintiff craigslist, Inc.'s ANSWER to #32 Counterclaim of Defendant PadMapper, Inc. byCraigslist, Inc(a Delaware corporation). (Kao, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2012) Modified on 11/21/2012 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3Taps, Inc, Padmapper, Inc., Brian R. Niessen, Discover Home Network, Inc. d/b/a Lovely. Filed byCraigslist, Inc. (Kao, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Craigslist, Inc. Withdrawing #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Padmapper, Inc., Amended Complaint due by 11/20/2012. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/15/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian P. Hennessy in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Craigslist, Inc byPadmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Padmapper, Inc. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Padmapper, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 11/13/2012. Replies due by 11/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION Extending Response Times filed by Padmapper, Inc.. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF CRAIGSLIST, INC.S TIME TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND RESPOND TO DEFENDANT 3TAPS, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (M Troiano) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (M Menitove) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (J Keyte) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Marissa Troiano ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7148482.) filed by 3Taps, Inc. (Troiano, Marissa) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael Menitove ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7148475.) filed by 3Taps, Inc. (Menitove, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James Keyte ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7148457.) filed by 3Taps, Inc. (Keyte, James) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 20 Defendant 3Taps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Craigslist, Inc by3Taps, Inc. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant PadMapper, Inc.'s Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611076646.). Filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craigslist, Inc v. 3Taps, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Bobbie Jean Wilson
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Represented By: David Dean Troutman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Represented By: Karen Esther Silverman
Represented By: Michael J. Reiss
Represented By: Perry Joseph Viscounty
Represented By: Robert J. Ellison
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: Geraldine Mary Daly Alexis
Represented By: James Patrick Corrigan
Represented By: Jason A. Yurasek
Represented By: Lauren Beth Cohen
Represented By: Nancy Cheng
Represented By: Shylah R. Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Taps, Inc
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Represented By: Christopher J. Bakes
Represented By: Abraham A. Tabaie
Represented By: David W. Hansen
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: James Patrick Schaefer
Represented By: Jason Erik Mueller
Represented By: M. Taylor Florence
Represented By: Marissa E Troiano
Represented By: Michael Menitove
Represented By: Patrick Maben Hammon
Represented By: Thomas V. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padmapper, Inc.
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Sean M. McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R. Niessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Home Network, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Lovely
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Represented By: Christopher J. Bakes
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Abraham A. Tabaie
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Marissa E Troiano
Represented By: Michael Menitove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Yaka, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Abraham A. Tabaie
Represented By: David W. Hansen
Represented By: James Patrick Schaefer
Represented By: Patrick Maben Hammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Kidd
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Abraham A. Tabaie
Represented By: David W. Hansen
Represented By: James Patrick Schaefer
Represented By: Patrick Maben Hammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Hanni M. Fakhoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?