Skinner v. Green Tree Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie Skinner
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv03834
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/14/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING re 41 Stipulation To Continue Response Deadline filed by Green Tree Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/1/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING re 9 Stipulation to Continue Response Deadline filed by Green Tree Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Skinner
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?