Monroe v. Orchard Hardware Supply et al
Plaintiff: Alice Monroe
Defendant: Orchard Hardware Supply, Jeff Caminata and Bruce Williams
Case Number: 3:2012cv03840
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISCHARGING 42 Order to Show Cause and CONTINUING Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/17/2014. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2014 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2014. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/7/2014. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Dismissing Claims Against Defendant Jeff Caminata Without Prejudice (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/3/2012.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/30/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Orchard Hardware Supply et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Monroe
Represented By: Ryan B Fay
Represented By: Arcolina Panto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Hardware Supply
Represented By: Catherine A. Conway
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Caminata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Williams
Represented By: Catherine A. Conway
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?