Third Degree Films, Inc. v. Does 1 - 178
Plaintiff: Third Degree Films, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 - 178
Case Number: 3:2012cv03858
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Severing and Dismissing Claims Against Does 2-178. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013).
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/2/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STANDING ORDER (Copy mailed to pro se defendant). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Motion to Quash (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 18 Stipulation to further Extend Time for Doe 129 To File A Motion to Quash or Otherwise Respond to the Subpoena to Non-Party Comcast. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time for Doe 129 To File a Motion to Quashor otherwise Respond to the Subpoena to Non-Party Comcast. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 13 Stipulation To Extend Time for DOE 106 to File A Motion to Quash or Otherwise Respond to the Subpoena to Non-Party Comcast. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING CMC - Status Report due by 10/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 4 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Immediate Discovery (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Third Degree Films, Inc. v. Does 1 - 178
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Third Degree Films, Inc.
Represented By: Anne-Leith Ferguson W Matlock
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Matlock
Represented By: Yue Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 178
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?